This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/04/2020 at 08:05:56 (UTC).

JONATHAN D MCMANIS, III Vs. JENNIFER D POWELL MCMANIS

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 JONATHAN D MCMANIS, III filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JENNIFER D POWELL MCMANIS. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LABRUZZO, CHRISTOPHER M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-FD

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LABRUZZO, CHRISTOPHER M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCMANIS, JONATHAN D, III

Oldsmar, FL 34677

Respondent

POWELL MCMANIS, JENNIFER D

Madeira Beach, FL 33772

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SIMONE A LENNON, ESQ

2454 Mcmullen Booth Rd Ste 401

Clearwater, FL 33759

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketPETITIONER'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Doc # 6; 04222020 10:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketMOTION; Doc # 8; FOR CONSIDERATION OF ILLNESS; Filed by: POWELL MCMANIS, JENNIFER D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • FinancialRESPONDENT; POWELL MCMANIS, JENNIFER D; Total Financial Assessment; 3.90; Total Payments and Credits; 3.90; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2020-01111; POWELL MCMANIS, JENNIFER D; (1.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • FinancialRESPONDENT; POWELL MCMANIS, JENNIFER D; Total Financial Assessment; 3.90; Total Payments and Credits; 3.90; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • FinancialRESPONDENT; POWELL MCMANIS, JENNIFER D; Total Financial Assessment; 3.90; Total Payments and Credits; 3.90; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2020-01109; POWELL MCMANIS, JENNIFER D; (2.70)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • FinancialRESPONDENT; POWELL MCMANIS, JENNIFER D; Total Financial Assessment; 3.90; Total Payments and Credits; 3.90; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 2.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCONTESTED ANSWER; Doc # 5; Party: POWELL MCMANIS, JENNIFER D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; MCMANIS, JONATHAN D, III; Total Financial Assessment; 418.00; Total Payments and Credits; 418.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-46039; MCMANIS, JONATHAN D; (418.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; MCMANIS, JONATHAN D, III; Total Financial Assessment; 418.00; Total Payments and Credits; 418.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 2; ISSUED; Party: POWELL MCMANIS, JENNIFER D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less