This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 02/20/2022 at 01:04:16 (UTC).

JOHN FITZGERALD SIMON, et al Vs. LISA ANN PERRY, et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 JOHN FITZGERALD SIMON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LISA ANN PERRY. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-CI

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIMON, JOHN FITZGERALD

Clearwater, FL 33765

SIMON, LINDA ELIZABETH

Clearwater, FL 33765

Defendants

PERRY, LISA ANN

Tarpon Springs, FL 34688

PRZYBYL, RAYMOND THOMAS, JR

Dunedin, FL 34698

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETER A SARTES, ESQ

Attorney at TRAGOS SARTES & TRAGOS PLLC

2363 Gulf To Bay Blvd Suite 100

Clearwater, FL 33765

Defendant Attorneys

ANDREW J LEWIS, ESQ

Attorney at QUINTAIROS PRIETO WOOD

1410 N Westshore Blvd Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33607

FELICIA M BECKER, ESQ

Attorney at QUINTAIROS PRIETO WOOD

1410 N Westshore Blvd Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33607

TERRY L KORS JR, ESQ

Attorney at QUINTAIROS PRIETO WOOD

1410 N Westshore Blvd Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33607

THOMAS ROBERT UNICE JR, ESQ

Attorney at UNICE SALZMAN JENSEN P A

Patriot Bank Bldg 2Nd Flr 1815 Little Road

Trinity, FL 34655-5301

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

10/06/2021: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

10/06/2021: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

SUMMONS - SERVED

10/11/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

10/06/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/06/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/06/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

10/06/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/06/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS - ISSUED

10/06/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

01/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/26/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/19/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/19/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/19/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/19/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

01/19/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

01/19/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

02/17/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER; Doc # 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 56

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 51; (CONSORTIUM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 53; (CONSORTIUM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF; Doc # 46; AMENDED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; SIMON, JOHN FITZGERALD; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 4; AS TO LISA ANN PERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 5; AS TO RAYMOND THOMAS PRZYBYL, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 6; AS TO LISA ANN PERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 7; AS TO RAYMOND THOMAS PRZYBYL, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 8; Party: PERRY, LISA ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 9; Party: PRZYBYL, RAYMOND THOMAS, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETER A SARTES, ESQ