This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 08/06/2021 at 07:15:57 (UTC).

JOHN B DECOSMO III DO PA, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR COLBY NINIS Vs. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 JOHN B DECOSMO III DO PA, AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR COLBY NINIS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-SC

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHN B DECOSMO III DO PA

St Petersburg, FL 33704

JOHN B DECOSMO III DO PA AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR NINIS, COLBY

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Fl Chief Financial Officer As Ra Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW D REEDER, ESQ

Attorney at REEDER & NUSSBAUM PA

2201 Fourth St North Suite G

St Petersburg, FL 33704

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

07/26/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED

CIV_CLK_Notices_SCZoom329057858

07/20/2021: SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL NOTICE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/16/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/16/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/16/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/16/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

07/16/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

07/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL; (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED; Doc # 7; Party: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; JOHN B DECOSMO III DO PA; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-27957; JOHN B DECOSMO III DO PA; (185.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; JOHN B DECOSMO III DO PA; Total Financial Assessment; 185.00; Total Payments and Credits; 185.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW D REEDER, ESQ