This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/22/2020 at 19:59:56 (UTC).

JOHN ARCHER,et al Vs. LANCO CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT INC

Case Summary

On 01/29/2015 JOHN ARCHER, filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against LANCO CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT INC. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, AMY M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-CI

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, AMY M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARCHER, JANIS

ARCHER, JOHN

Defendant

LANCO CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT INC A FLORIDA CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

NORANDEX BUILDING MATERIALS DISTRIBUTION INC NOW KNOWN AS AMERICAN BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS SUPPLY CO INC

SIMONTON WINDOWS INC A WEST VIRGINIA CORPORATION

ARCHER, CHRISTOPHER

LEAKS LABOR INC

N S J FRAMING INC

MCDONALD-ALUMINUM-VINYL-LLC A FLORIDA CORPORATION

JAMES, MATT

NORANDEX BUILDING MATERIALS DISTRIBUTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM A BACKER, ESQ

Attorney at KUBICKI DRAPER

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 1200

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

BRIAN P DEEB, ESQ

Attorney at DEEB LAW GROUP PA

6677 - 13Th Ave N Ste 3-A

St Petersburg, FL 33710

ROBERT A CRABILL

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF SONYA S WESNER

200 E Robinson St Ste 510

Orlando, FL 32801

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

ANDREW J MCBRIDE, ESQ

Attorney at ADAMS & REESE LLP

150 Second Ave N #1700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

BRYAN M KRASINSKI, ESQ

Attorney at KUBICKI DRAPER

400 N Ashley Dr #1200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

ORDER

05/06/2020: ORDER

AMENDED NOTICE MEDIATION CONFERENCE

01/03/2020: AMENDED NOTICE MEDIATION CONFERENCE

EXHIBIT

04/06/2020: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

04/13/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

07/17/2020: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

01/03/2020: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

05/12/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/20/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

05/11/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

185 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Doc # 73; PLTFS MTN TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 72; PROPOSED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 69; 10162020 11:30 (TELEPHONIC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 70; (CROSS) 10162020 11:30 (TELEPHONIC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMOTION; Doc # 71; TO ENFORCE SETTLMENT; Filed by: N S J FRAMING INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 67; TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 68; A - EMAIL DATED 08242020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Doc # 66; IS GRANTED 08242020 9:45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 64; FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 65; A- COPY ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
191 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2015
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; LANCO CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT, INC TO THE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; AND DISCLOSURE/DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; ARCHER, JOHN; Total Financial Assessment; 450.00; Total Payments and Credits; 450.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2015-03949; ARCHER, JOHN; (410.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; ARCHER, JOHN; Total Financial Assessment; 450.00; Total Payments and Credits; 450.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED ON 1/30/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Simonton Windows Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRABILL , ROBERT ALAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEEB , BRIAN PAUL