Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/11/2021 at 21:37:08 (UTC).

JOHAD SALEH AFLAK Vs. MELINDA ANN BRUMITT

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 JOHAD SALEH AFLAK filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MELINDA ANN BRUMITT. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, 501 Building St Petersburg - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-FD

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    501 Building St Petersburg - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AFLAK, JOHAD SALEH

St Petersburg, FL 33705

Respondent

BRUMITT, MELINDA ANN

St Petersburg, FL 33705

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCC JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketSIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION HEARING; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION (SRS); Doc # 10; Vol./Book 20763, Page 1813, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 9; HEARING WAS RESCHEDULED FROM 10/22/19 TO 11/5/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; AFLAK, JOHAD SALEH; Total Financial Assessment; 421.00; Total Payments and Credits; 421.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2019-15973; AFLAK, JOHAD SALEH; (421.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; AFLAK, JOHAD SALEH; Total Financial Assessment; 421.00; Total Payments and Credits; 421.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; AFLAK, JOHAD SALEH; Total Financial Assessment; 421.00; Total Payments and Credits; 421.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 414.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION REGARDING PARTIES; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER DEFENDANT - RESPONDENT; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE; Doc # 7; Party: AFLAK, JOHAD SALEH; Party: BRUMITT, MELINDA ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less