This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 02/14/2021 at 05:58:19 (UTC).

JOAN STERLING Vs. EGRET COVE REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 JOAN STERLING filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against EGRET COVE REHABILITATION CENTER LLC. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STERLING, JOAN

Defendants

EGRET COVE REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

EGRET COVE REHABILITATION CENTER LLC DOING BUSINESS AS EGRET COVE CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTA M CARPENTER

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/31/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/05/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/31/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

01/20/2020: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

MEMORANDUM OF LAW

04/03/2020: MEMORANDUM OF LAW

MEMORANDUM OF LAW

03/04/2020: MEMORANDUM OF LAW

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

03/11/2020: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL

01/30/2020: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/31/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Doc # 20; DEFT MOTN COMPEL ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW; Doc # 19; IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 17; PROPOSED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketORDER; Doc # 18; ON DEFT MOTN COMPEL ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW; Doc # 15; IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 16; 1 - DEFENDANT EGRET COVE REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF; Doc # 13; OBJECTIONS TO PLTFS INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketOBJECTION; Doc # 14; TO PLTFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 12; 03102020 10:30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL; Doc # 9; ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2020
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; STERLING, JOAN; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS); Doc # 7; ISSUED; Party: EGRET COVE REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; STERLING, JOAN; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2019-49236; STERLING, JOAN; (400.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; STERLING, JOAN; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 3; NOT ISSUED- NEED SUMMONS FEE OF $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less