This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/28/2020 at 16:59:07 (UTC).

JESSE R WILLIAMS Vs. GRACE V WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 11/02/2015 JESSE R WILLIAMS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GRACE. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Criminal Justice Center - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PIERCE, JAMES. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-FD

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PIERCE, JAMES

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILLIAMS, JESSE R

Tampa, FL 33626

Respondent

WILLIAMS, GRACE V

Safety Harbor, FL 34695

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

FRANCES E MARTINEZ

Attorney at OLDER LUNDY AND ALVAREZ

1000 W Cass St

Tampa, FL 33606

MATTHEW D CLARIE, ESQ

Attorney at CLAIRE LAW OFFICES P A.

708 S Church Ave

Tampa, FL 33609

MATTHEW D CLARIE

Attorney at CLARIE LAW OFFICES PA

2502 North Howard Ave Ste 204

Tampa, FL 33607

Respondent Attorney

SHANNON MARTIN LAFRANCE

Attorney at LAFRANCE LAW PA

2503 West Swann Ave Suite 116

Tampa, FL 33609

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketARREARS CALCULATION SHEET; Doc # 56

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketINCOME DEDUCTION ORDER; Doc # 53; TERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 54; PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketSTIPULATION-ORDER (R); Doc # 55; MODIFYING FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Vol./Book 20705, Page 495, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 52; OF RECEIPT/ACTION OF GARNISHMENT MODIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketARREARS CALCULATION SHEET; Doc # 50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketCOPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE; Doc # 51; CURRENT SUPPORT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketEVIDENCE DESTROYED; Doc # 49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 48; TO COURT/ AGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketARREARS CALCULATION SHEET; Doc # 47

    Read MoreRead Less
140 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2015
  • FinancialPETITIONER; WILLIAMS, JESSE R; Total Financial Assessment; 546.95; Total Payments and Credits; 546.95; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2015-14146; WILLIAMS, JESSE R; (418.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • FinancialPETITIONER; WILLIAMS, JESSE R; Total Financial Assessment; 546.95; Total Payments and Credits; 546.95; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER; TO PETITIONER; Party: WILLIAMS, GRACE V

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-DECLARATION UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketPETITIONER'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAFRANCE , SHANNON MARTIN