This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/15/2022 at 16:26:13 (UTC).

JENNIFER TERRANA Vs. BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC

Case Summary

On 12/31/2021 JENNIFER TERRANA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CI

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERRANA, JENNIFER AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ESTATE OF AUDREY WILHITE

Saint Petersburg, FL 33705

Defendant

BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BOCA CIEGA CENTER

1665 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd. Suite 400

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHANE A NEWLANDS, ESQ

Attorney at NEWLANDS & CLARK

11161 East State Road 70 Suite 110-168

Lakewood Ranch, FL 34202

Defendant Attorneys

KRISTEN OVER, ESQ

Attorney at SPECTOR GADON ROSEN

360 Central Ave Ste 1550

St Petersburg, FL 33701

AMY L CHRISTIANSEN, ESQ

Attorney at SPECTOR GADON ROSEN

360 Central Ave Ste 1550

St. Petersburg, FL 33701

GEORGE M VINCI JR, ESQ

Attorney at SPECTOR GADON & ROSEN

360 Central Ave Ste 1550

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE

04/12/2022: RESPONSE

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/12/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

03/01/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/28/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/28/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

02/28/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

02/28/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

03/01/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

OBJECTION

02/18/2022: OBJECTION

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 27; 06082022 2:45 TELEPHONIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE; Doc # 28; DEFT'S RESPONSE TO PLTF'S OBJECTION T NON-PARTY SUBPOENA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 26; (MEDICARE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 21; (MEDICARE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 23; (MEDICARE) W/ATTACHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 24; W/ATTACHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE; Doc # 18; PLAINTIFF S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Doc # 19; TO REQUEST ORAL ARGUMENT ON DEFT MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 11; (MEDICARE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE; Doc # 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 4; Party: BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 5; OF AGREED UPON ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TERRANA, JENNIFER; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-00106; TERRANA, JENNIFER; (410.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; TERRANA, JENNIFER; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party: BOCA CIEGA REHABILITATION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less