This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/10/2022 at 20:01:31 (UTC).

JEFFREY DILLON Vs. RENEE SJOSTEDT

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 JEFFREY DILLON filed an Other lawsuit against RENEE SJOSTEDT. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JIROTKA, GEORGE M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CI

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JIROTKA, GEORGE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DILLON, JEFFREY

Trinity, FL 34655

Defendant

SJOSTEDT, RENEE

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS ROBERT UNICE JR, ESQ

Attorney at UNICE SALZMAN JENSEN P A

Patriot Bank Bldg 2Nd Flr 1815 Little Road

Trinity, FL 34655-5301

Defendant Attorney

DENNIS O'CONNOR

Attorney at O'CONNOR & O'CONNOR LLC

800 North Magnolia Ave Suite 1350

Orlando, FL 32803

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

10/12/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

SUMMONS - ISSUED

10/12/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

COMPLAINT

10/12/2021: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/02/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/03/2021: AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/08/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/02/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/02/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/02/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/02/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/16/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 9; OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 5; Party: SJOSTEDT, RENEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketAMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Doc # 4; ANSWER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT; Party: SJOSTEDT, RENEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; DILLON, JEFFREY; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-39404; DILLON, JEFFREY; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; DILLON, JEFFREY; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 2; Party: SJOSTEDT, RENEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS ROBERT UNICE JR, ESQ