This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/27/2019 at 07:00:18 (UTC).

JEFF WARE Vs. JAMES ROBINSON

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 JEFF WARE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JAMES ROBINSON. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARASSAS, JOHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-CO

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Historic Courthouse - County

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARASSAS, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WARE, JEFF

Clearwater, FL 33755

Defendant

ROBINSON, JAMES

Clearwater, FL 33755

 

Court Documents

LEASE

12/06/2019: LEASE

COMPLAINT - 1 COUNT

12/06/2019: COMPLAINT - 1 COUNT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/06/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

12/13/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

DEFAULT ENTERED

12/18/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED

THREE DAY NOTICE

12/06/2019: THREE DAY NOTICE

SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

12/06/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

WRIT OF POSSESSION

12/24/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/17/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT

FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

12/19/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM - FDFM

12/20/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

CERT OF MAILING - CO

12/10/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

AUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER

12/06/2019: AUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/17/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2019
  • HearingWRIT OF POSSESSION; Doc # 17; OTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • HearingFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • HearingDEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO); Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • HearingFINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION; Doc # 16; IN FAVOR OF PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • HearingDEFAULT ENTERED; Doc # 12; CT 1; Party: ROBINSON, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • HearingUNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE; Doc # 13; FINAL JUDGMENT W/ ENVS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • HearingPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • HearingPLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • HearingSUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED; Doc # 9; 121019; Party: ROBINSON, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • HearingCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Doc # 8; Party: ROBINSON, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingSUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER; Doc # 4; FOR SERVICE; Party: ROBINSON, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingLEASE; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingAUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • HearingAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; WARE, JEFF; Total Financial Assessment; 204.53; Total Payments and Credits; 204.53; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-32013; WARE, JEFF; (1.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; WARE, JEFF; Total Financial Assessment; 204.53; Total Payments and Credits; 204.53; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 1.83

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; WARE, JEFF; Total Financial Assessment; 204.53; Total Payments and Credits; 204.53; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-31196; WARE, JEFF; (202.70)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; WARE, JEFF; Total Financial Assessment; 204.53; Total Payments and Credits; 204.53; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; WARE, JEFF; Total Financial Assessment; 204.53; Total Payments and Credits; 204.53; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 7.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • PLAINTIFF; WARE, JEFF; Total Financial Assessment; 204.53; Total Payments and Credits; 204.53; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.