This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/12/2021 at 13:10:23 (UTC).

JEANETTE OJEDA Vs. MICHELLE EGERTER, et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 JEANETTE OJEDA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MICHELLE EGERTER. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MEYER, KEITH. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-CI

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MEYER, KEITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OJEDA, JEANETTE

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendants

RENAISSANCE HOTEL OPERATING COMPANY

10400 Fernwood Rd.

Bethesda, MD 20817

EGERTER, MICHELLE

St. Petersburg, FL 33705

RENAISSANCE HOTEL OPERATING COMPANY A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION

10400 Fernwood Rd.

Bethesda, MD 20817

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRANDON F JONES

217 N Howard Ave Ste 102

Tampa, FL 33606

BRANDON F JONES, ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

ROBERT E HEYMAN, ESQ

KARI K JACOBSON, ESQ

Attorney at LA CAVA AND JACOBSON P A

Bmo Harris Plaza Ste 1250 501 E Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

08/19/2020: NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

07/21/2020: NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

ORDER

06/05/2020: ORDER

EXHIBIT

05/04/2020: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

05/04/2020: EXHIBIT

DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE

05/04/2020: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/24/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/14/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/17/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PRIVILEGE LOG

01/09/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/09/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF FILING

01/02/2020: NOTICE OF FILING

REQUEST FOR COPIES

12/20/2019: REQUEST FOR COPIES

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

11/21/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

11/07/2019: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/21/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/21/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/21/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDISMISSED-SETTLEMENT AFTER HRG (SRS DISPO); Doc # 50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Doc # 51; WITH PREJUDICE AS TO MICHELE EGERTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 49; OF ACCEPTANCE OF DEFENDANT MICHELE EGERTER'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; Doc # 48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; Doc # 47

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketORDER; Doc # 45; ON PENDING MOTIONS/ TO SET ASIDE CLERKS DEFAULT IS GRANTED/OTHER MOTIONS WITHDRAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE; Doc # 46; PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE; Doc # 41; CLERK'S DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 42; AFFIDAVIT OF MICHELE EGERTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 43; CALLS FOR SERVICE REPORT CALL ID: 2019237749

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 6; ISSUED; Party: EGERTER, MICHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Doc # 7; ISSUED; Party: RENAISSANCE HOTEL OPERATING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Renaissance Hotel Operating Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEYMAN , ROBERT E

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacobson, Kari Katzman