Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/12/2021 at 00:44:17 (UTC).

JASON ANTHONY TIBE Vs. VALERIE ANN TIBE

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 JASON ANTHONY TIBE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VALERIE ANN TIBE. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, 501 Building St Petersburg - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-FD

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    501 Building St Petersburg - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioners

TIBE, JASON

St Petersburg, FL 33713

TIBE, JASON ANTHONY

St Petersburg, FL 33713

Respondents

TIBE, VALERIE

St Petersburg, FL 33713

TIBE, VALERIE ANN

St Petersburg, FL 33713

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • FinancialRESPONDENT; TIBE, VALERIE ANN; Total Financial Assessment; 3.00; Total Payments and Credits; 3.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2019-18089; TIBE, VALERIE ANN; (3.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • FinancialRESPONDENT; TIBE, VALERIE ANN; Total Financial Assessment; 3.00; Total Payments and Credits; 3.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketCC JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketSIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION HEARING; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION (SRS); Doc # 9; Vol./Book 20746, Page 614, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; TIBE, JASON ANTHONY; Total Financial Assessment; 421.00; Total Payments and Credits; 421.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2019-16079; TIBE, JASON; (421.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; TIBE, JASON ANTHONY; Total Financial Assessment; 421.00; Total Payments and Credits; 421.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • FinancialPETITIONER; TIBE, JASON ANTHONY; Total Financial Assessment; 421.00; Total Payments and Credits; 421.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 414.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketPETITION (SRS); Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PLAINTIFF - PETITIONER; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketSEALED SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER DEFENDANT - RESPONDENT; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION REGARDING PARTIES; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE; Doc # 7; Party: TIBE, JASON ANTHONY; Party: TIBE, VALERIE ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less