This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/16/2023 at 17:57:06 (UTC).

JASON JONES Vs. SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 JASON JONES filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, AMY M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-CI

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, AMY M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES, JASON

Defendant

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW K MULLINAX, ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

TAYLOR RICHARD BOWMAN

BURKE G LOPEZ, ESQ

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING

06/22/2022: NOTICE OF FILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

06/17/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

06/17/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/17/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/17/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/17/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/20/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

EXHIBIT

06/22/2022: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

08/09/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/06/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/06/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

07/08/2022: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/18/2022: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

07/25/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

PRIVILEGE LOG

08/09/2022: PRIVILEGE LOG

MOTION

08/09/2022: MOTION

NOTICE

11/17/2022: NOTICE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/17/2022

DocketNOTICE; Doc # 18; OF SETTLEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 15; (VERIFIED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketPRIVILEGE LOG; Doc # 16

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketMOTION; Doc # 17; FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME; Filed by:; SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2022

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER; Doc # 14

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2022

DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Doc # 13; / ANSWER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022

DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Doc # 11

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022

DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 12; W/ ATTACHMENTS; Party:; SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2022

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 9; / DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES; Party:; SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2022

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022

DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 7; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022

DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 8; A-SUMMONS SERVED 062222

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2022

DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 2; Party:; SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2022

FinancialPLAINTIFF; JONES, JASON; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-21726; JONES, JASON; (410.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2022

FinancialPLAINTIFF; JONES, JASON; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2022

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2022

DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2022

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 4

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2022

DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2022

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 6

[+] Read More [-] Read Less