Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 05/23/2021 at 20:04:47 (UTC).

JANINE BOONE Vs. STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY, et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 JANINE BOONE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEWTON, CYNTHIA J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-CI

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEWTON, CYNTHIA J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOONE, JANINE AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ESTATE OF RICHARD BOONE

Weston, FL 33331

Defendants

CITY OF ST PETERSBURG

St. Petersburg, FL 33701

GROVER, ANDREW

St. Petersburg, FL 33702

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF CITY OF ST PETERSBURG EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM

St. Petersburg, FL 33701

STATE FARM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 3040

Newark, OH 43058-9827

STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 2800

Portland, OR 97208

Not Yet Classified

BOONE, ROSEANN

Greensburg, PA 15601

BOONE, DEBORAH

Greensburg, PA 15601

BOONE, RONALD

Bradenton, FL 34208

Not Classified By Court

BOONE, RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITNEY PAGE, ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JASON TURCHIN

2883 Executive Park Drive Suite 103

Weston, FL 33331

Defendant Attorneys

JOSEPH P PATNER

Attorney at EXECUTIVE ASSISTANT CITY ATTY

2842

St Petersburg, FL 33731

JANE ELLEN WALLACE, ESQ

Attorney at ASSISTANT CITY ATTORNEY OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY

2842

St Petersburg, FL 33731

ANISHA C ATCHANAH

Attorney at KIM VAUGHN LERNER LLP

One Financial Plaza 100 Se Third Ave Ste 2001

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394

LELIA M M SCHLEIER, ESQ

Attorney at MCDOWELL HETHERINGTON LLP

2385 N W Executive Ctr Dr Ste 400

Boca Raton, FL 33431

WENDY L FURMAN, ESQ

Attorney at MCDOWELL HETHERINGTON LLP

2385 N W Executive Ctr Dr Ste 400

Boca Raton, FL 33431

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS - ISSUED

05/19/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/15/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/13/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

04/01/2021: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/01/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/22/2021: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/19/2021: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS - ISSUED

03/19/2021: THIRD PARTY SUMMONS - ISSUED

SUMMONS - SERVED

03/11/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

03/04/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

SUMMONS - SERVED

03/04/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/22/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/22/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/22/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/22/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/22/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/22/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT E-FILED

02/22/2021: COMPLAINT E-FILED

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; BOONE, JANINE; Total Financial Assessment; 460.00; Total Payments and Credits; 450.00; Balance Due 10.00; Transaction Assessment; 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketORDER DENYING; Doc # 65; PLTF MOTN FOR DEFAULT FNAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 66; Party: GROVER, ANDREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 64

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 61

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 62

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION; Doc # 60; FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 56

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 16; ISSUED; Party: STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 20; ISSUED; Party: STATE FARM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 23

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where The Standard Insurance Co. Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAGE , WHITNEY