This case was last updated from Pinellas County Courts on 04/03/2022 at 20:01:57 (UTC).

JANE NEMCOVA, et al Vs. TYPTAP INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 JANE NEMCOVA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against TYPTAP INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Pinellas County Courts, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-CI

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEMCOVA, JANE

Tampa, FL 33606

NEMEC, ONDREJ

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant

TYPTAP INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street C/O Chief Financial Officer

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW K MULLINAX, ESQ

Attorney at MAKRIS & MULLINAX P A

908 West Horatio St

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorneys

ALEXANDER M BACHIK, ESQ

Attorney at COLE SCOTT & KISSANE P A

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

ALEXANDER M BACHIK

4301 West Boy Scout Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

01/03/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/03/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/03/2022: SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/03/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/03/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/03/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS - SERVED

01/06/2022: SUMMONS - SERVED

DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

01/21/2022: DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/20/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

01/21/2022: DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

03/01/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER

RESPONSE

02/01/2022: RESPONSE

NOTICE OF FILING

02/01/2022: NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF FILING

02/01/2022: NOTICE OF FILING

RESPONSE

02/01/2022: RESPONSE

NOTICE

02/21/2022: NOTICE

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/14/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 17; 05232022 10:45 TELEPHONIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER; Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE; Doc # 15; OF REQUEST FOR COURT TO CONSIDER MOTION BASED ON WRITTEN SUBMISSIONS WITHOUT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE; Doc # 11; TO DEFENDANT S MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 12; TRIAL COURT ORDERS IN SUPPORT OF PLTFS RESPONSE TO DEFT S MOTN TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 13; FLORIDA SUPREME COURT CASES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFT S MOTN TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE; Doc # 14; IN OPPOSITION TO DEFT S MOTN FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER/STAY OF DISCOVERY PENDING MOTN TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS; Doc # 10; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 7; 01042022 W/ATTACHED NOTICE OF FILING; Party: TYPTAP INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; NEMCOVA, JANE; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2022-00124; NEMCOVA, JANE; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; NEMCOVA, JANE; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 3; Party: TYPTAP INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TYPTAP INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MULLINAX MATTHEW K