This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/01/2021 at 20:00:43 (UTC).

JAMES R MOCK Vs. HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 JAMES R MOCK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, AMY M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-CI

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, AMY M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOCK, JAMES R

Saint Petersburg, FL 33713

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

2600 Mccormick Drive Suite 300

Clearwater, FL 33759

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COREY B JUSTUS, ESQ

Attorney at THE NATION LAW FIRM LLP

570 Crown Oak Centre Dr

Longwood, FL 32750

Defendant Attorney

DAVID A BARRERA, ESQ

Attorney at HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INS CO

2600 Mccormick Dr Ste 300

Clearwater, FL 33759

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

09/02/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED

COMPLAINT

09/02/2021: COMPLAINT

CORRESPONDENCE

09/02/2021: CORRESPONDENCE

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

09/02/2021: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/02/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/02/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/02/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS - ISSUED

09/02/2021: SUMMONS - ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/21/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS - SERVED

09/14/2021: SUMMONS - SERVED

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE

09/20/2021: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY

10/20/2021: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY

DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/04/2021: DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

11/15/2021: ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF

MOTION

11/04/2021: MOTION

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; Doc # 15; Party: HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketMOTION; Doc # 14; DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY; Doc # 13; TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY; Party: HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Doc # 12; TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Doc # 11; AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES; Party: HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 9; 09022021 W/ATTACHED NOTICE OF FILING; Party: HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MOCK, JAMES R; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2021-34256; MOCK, JAMES R; (410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; MOCK, JAMES R; Total Financial Assessment; 410.00; Total Payments and Credits; 410.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; Doc # 8; Party: HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justus, Corey Bryan