Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/08/2021 at 14:27:24 (UTC).

JACK L COLLINS, et al Vs. ANNA MARIE DARRING, et al

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 JACK L COLLINS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANNA MARIE DARRING. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-CI

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COLLINS, PATRICIA A

St Petersburg, FL 33704

COLLINS, JACK L

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendants

DARRING, RODNEY WALTER

Largo, FL 33778

DARRING, ANNA MARIE

Largo, FL 33778

 

Court Documents

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice324357438-773

09/25/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice324357438-772

09/25/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice324357438-771

09/25/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

CIV_CLK_DismissalNotice324357438-770

09/25/2020: DISMISSAL NOTICE

PLTF-PET'S MOTION

11/16/2020: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL

10/11/2019: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL

MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT

09/18/2019: MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

08/29/2019: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

PLTF-PET'S MOTION

08/02/2019: PLTF-PET'S MOTION

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

07/25/2019: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER OF

07/15/2019: ANSWER OF

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

08/14/2019: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

07/01/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

07/01/2019: SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED

COMPLAINT

06/19/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/19/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

06/19/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

06/19/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCANCELED; DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M); CURRENT ACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; DARRING, ANNA MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 0.30; Total Payments and Credits; 0.30; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2020-12597; DARRING, ANNA MARIE; (0.30)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • FinancialDEFENDANT; DARRING, ANNA MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 0.30; Total Payments and Credits; 0.30; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 0.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 15; TO STAY ENTRY OF JUDGMENT W/PROPOSED UNSIGNED ORDER W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL; Doc # 13; --- SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketMEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE; Doc # 11; 091719 1:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketPLTF-PET'S MOTION; Doc # 9; FOR MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Doc # 8; 073119 2:45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketANSWER OF; Doc # 7; W/ATTACHMENTS; Party: DARRING, ANNA MARIE; Party: DARRING, RODNEY WALTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 5; 062519; Party: DARRING, RODNEY WALTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS - SERVED; Doc # 6; 062519; Party: DARRING, ANNA MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; COLLINS, JACK L; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2019-15873; JP LAMAR PROPERTIES LLC; (420.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • FinancialPLAINTIFF; COLLINS, JACK L; Total Financial Assessment; 420.00; Total Payments and Credits; 420.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER; Doc # 1; Party: DARRING, RODNEY WALTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER; Doc # 2; Party: DARRING, ANNA MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Doc # 4; WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less