This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/21/2023 at 21:02:43 (UTC).

IN RE: THE MATTER OF VINCENT M HARDINA

Case Summary

On 12/07/2022 IN RE THE MATTER OF VINCENT M HARDINA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-IN

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Interested Parties and Petitioners

FRALEY, ANGELINE

Clearwater, FL 33756

COWAN, LISA

HARDINA, KATHIE

Not Classified By Court

HARDINA, VINCENT M

Clearwater, FL 33756

PALMER, PAMELA

WHITING, BRUCE R, PHD

YOUNG, ROBERT

FUENTES, SARA

Polk City, FL 33868

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party and Petitioner Attorney

SCOTT W VIETH, ESQ

Attorney at MACFARLANE FERGUSON & MCMULLEN P A

625 Court Street, Suite 200

Clearwater, FL 33756

Not Classified By Court Attorney

N MICHAEL KOUSKOUTIS, ESQ

Attorney at N MICHAEL KOUSKOUTIS P A

623 East Tarpon Ave -A

Tarpon Springs, FL 34689

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketIN/GD; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers TEARNEY, BAMA, SAMIS, KEELA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Doc # 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketREPORT OF COMMITTEE Doc # 9; Physician:; YOUNG, ROBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2022
  • DocketREPORT OF COMMITTEE Doc # 6; Physician:; PALMER, PAMELA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketREPORT OF COMMITTEE Doc # 5; Physician:; WHITING, BRUCE R, PHD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketATTORNEY APPOINTED Doc # 3; Attorney:; KOUSKOUTIS, N MICHAEL, ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE ALLEG INC, ORD APT COM, CNSEL, PROC SER Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialINTERESTED PARTY; FRALEY, ANGELINE; Total Financial Assessment; 231.00; Total Payments and Credits; 231.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2022-43985; FRALEY, ANGELINE; (231.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialINTERESTED PARTY; FRALEY, ANGELINE; Total Financial Assessment; 231.00; Total Payments and Credits; 231.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 231.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE INCAPACITY Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT Doc # 2; "A" AFFIDAVIT OF MAYKEL LUNA CONCEPCION MD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less