This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/16/2019 at 05:01:33 (UTC).

IN RE: THE MATTER OF THOMAS POGGIO

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 IN RE THE MATTER OF THOMAS POGGIO was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLAN, LINDA R. and COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-IN

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ALLAN, LINDA R.

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARRUTHERS, LORI

Seminole, FL 33756

Not Classified By Court

POGGIO, THOMAS

Clearwater, FL 33759

LUFKIN, ROBERT, MD

St Petersburg, FL 33702

WHEATON, CHARLES H, PHD

Clearwater, FL 33764

HAGENBUCH, JACQUELINE

Largo, FL 33773

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROBERT C THOMPSON, JR

Attorney at THOMPSON & FERNALD PA

611 Druid Street East Suite 705

Clearwater, FL 33756

Not Classified By Court Attorney

BRIAN M BURSA

Attorney at ULLMAN BURSA LAW

3812 Coconut Palm Dr Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33619

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • IN/GD; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers TEARNEY, BAMA, SAMIS, KEELA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • REPORT OF COMMITTEE; Doc # 10; HAGENBUCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • REPORT OF COMMITTEE; Doc # 9; WHEATON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • REPORT OF COMMITTEE; Doc # 8; LUKFIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • ATTORNEY APPOINTED; Doc # 5; BRIAN BURSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • NOTICE ALLEG INC, ORD APT COM, CNSEL, PROC SER; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE INCAPACITY; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • PETITIONER; CARRUTHERS, LORI; Total Financial Assessment; 0.00; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 0.00; INDIGENT; 231.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • PETITIONER; CARRUTHERS, LORI; Total Financial Assessment; 0.00; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 231.00

    Read MoreRead Less