This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/08/2023 at 16:01:59 (UTC).

IN RE: THE MATTER OF LEONARDA FRENCH

Case Summary

On 02/15/2023 IN RE THE MATTER OF LEONARDA FRENCH was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CAMPBELL, PAMELA A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9-IN

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CAMPBELL, PAMELA A

 

Party Details

Interested Parties and Petitioners

NEWMARK-MILLER, LISA

ARMAS, HELGA

AYALA, JOSEPHINE

GONSALEZ, AMERICA

MERCADO, MARIA

RIOS TORREZ, FRANCISCO

RIOS, CEFERINO

RIOS, JULIO

RIOS, JUSTINA

RIOS, MANRIQUE

ROMAN, DELIA

Not Classified By Court

FRENCH, LEONARDA

LYONS, ALECIA

BOONE, JAMES, PHD

DELIKAT, TERRENCE, DO

STIRRUP, OLGA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court, Interested Party and Petitioner Attorneys

THOMAS GLENN TRIPP

N MICHAEL KOUSKOUTIS, ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketIN/GD; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officers TEARNEY, BAMA, SAMIS, KEELA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketREMINDER COMMITTEE REPORT DUE Doc # 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketREPORT OF COMMITTEE Doc # 27; Physician:; STIRRUP, OLGA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELOCATION OF WARD Doc # 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SERVED Doc # 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • FinancialEMERGENCY TEMP GUARDIAN; LYONS, ALECIA; Total Financial Assessment; 8.00; Total Payments and Credits; 8.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # PR-2023-001181; LYONS, ALECIA; (8.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • FinancialEMERGENCY TEMP GUARDIAN; LYONS, ALECIA; Total Financial Assessment; 8.00; Total Payments and Credits; 8.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketETG; (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officers TEARNEY, BAMA, SAMIS, KEELA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketREPORT OF COMMITTEE Doc # 19; Physician:; DELIKAT, TERRENCE, DO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketEXHIBIT Doc # 9; FLORIDA POWER OF ATTORNEY REVOCATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketEXHIBIT Doc # 10; DESIGNATION OF HEALTH CARE SURROGATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketEXHIBIT Doc # 11; FLORIDA POWER OF ATTORNEY REVOCATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketEXAMINEE CONTACT INFO SHEET Doc # 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • FinancialINTERESTED PARTY; NEWMARK-MILLER, LISA; Total Financial Assessment; 231.00; Total Payments and Credits; 231.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2023-06035; NEWMARK-MILLER, LISA; (231.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • FinancialINTERESTED PARTY; NEWMARK-MILLER, LISA; Total Financial Assessment; 231.00; Total Payments and Credits; 231.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 231.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE INCAPACITY Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketPETITION TO APPOINT EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketATTORNEY APPOINTED Doc # 4; Attorney:; KOUSKOUTIS, N MICHAEL, ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less