This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/25/2019 at 05:01:05 (UTC).

IN RE: THE MATTER OF JOHN THOMAS WYNNE

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 IN RE THE MATTER OF JOHN THOMAS WYNNE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-IN

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WYNNE, ADELIS MARIE

Avon Lake, OH 33756

Not Classified By Court

WYNNE, JOHN THOMAS

Belleair Bluffs, FL 33770

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

AUBREY POSEY

Attorney at HITCHCOCK LAW GROUP

635 Court St Ste 202

Clearwater, FL 33756

AUBREY ELIZABETH POSEY

Attorney at HITCHCOCK LAW GROUP

635 Court St Ste 202

Clearwater, FL 33756

Not Classified By Court Attorney

GRETCHEN-ELIZABETH

443

Lithia, FL 33547

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • IN/GD; (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer SAMIS, KEELA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • REPORT OF COMMITTEE; Doc # 10; MCCLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • REPORT OF COMMITTEE; Doc # 9; MCCLAIN COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • REPORT OF COMMITTEE; Doc # 8; BOURNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • REPORT OF COMMITTEE; Doc # 7; LUFKIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • NOTICE ALLEG INC, ORD APT COM, CNSEL, PROC SER; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR INDIGENCY - APPROVED; Doc # 1; ML

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE INCAPACITY; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • ATTORNEY APPOINTED; Doc # 4; GRETCHEN ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • PETITIONER; WYNNE, ADELIS MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 0.00; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 0.00; INDIGENT; 231.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • PETITIONER; WYNNE, ADELIS MARIE; Total Financial Assessment; 0.00; Total Payments and Credits; 0.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 231.00

    Read MoreRead Less