Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 03/29/2021 at 23:03:01 (UTC).

IN RE: THE MATTER OF G D

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 IN RE THE MATTER OF G D was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-GD

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM

 

Party Details

Petitioners

UGARTE, MYRA

Tampa, FL 33601

DELLAGUARDIAN, JOSEPH

Port Saint Lucie, FL 34953

Not Classified By Court

D, G

Tampa, FL 33601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PATRICK D BRANNON

Attorney at WINTERS & YONKER

3342

Tampa, FL 33601

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketORDER - CHECKLIST; Doc # 4; EMAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; UGARTE, MYRA; Total Financial Assessment; 231.00; Total Payments and Credits; 231.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2021-07175; UGARTE, MYRA; (231.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; UGARTE, MYRA; Total Financial Assessment; 231.00; Total Payments and Credits; 231.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 231.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 2; A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 3; B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRANNON , PATRICK DOUGLAS