This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/26/2023 at 14:11:00 (UTC).

IN RE: THE MATTER OF DAVID REED

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 IN RE THE MATTER OF DAVID REED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CAMPBELL, PAMELA A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-IN

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CAMPBELL, PAMELA A

 

Party Details

Interested Parties and Petitioners

NEWARK-MILLER, LISA

REED, ANNAMARIE

REED, WILLIAM

Not Classified By Court

REED, DAVID

BALLEW, ELISA

BOURNE, TRACEY RAE

WILLIAMS, DARLENE, PHD

YOUNG, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court, Interested Party and Petitioner Attorneys

THOMAS GLENN TRIPP

MICHAEL SNIVELY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/20/2023

DocketIN/GD; (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer SAMIS, KEELA)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023

DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SERVED Doc # 31

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2023

DocketMASTER'S FINDINGS RECOMMENDED ORDER Doc # 27

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2023

DocketORDER APPOINTING EMERGENCY TEMP GUARDIAN Doc # 28; Vol./Book 22322, Page 232, 2 pages

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2023

DocketORDER Doc # 29; TO FINANCIAL INSTITUTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2023

DocketLETTERS OF EMG TEMP GDN Doc # 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

DocketETG; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officers TEARNEY, BAMA, SAMIS, KEELA)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

DocketAPPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN Doc # 22

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN Doc # 23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

DocketNOTICE OF FILING Doc # 24

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
01/12/2023

DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE INCAPACITY Doc # 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketEXHIBIT Doc # 2; A PHYSICIAN'S REPORT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketEXHIBIT Doc # 3; B EXPENSES AND LETTER OF DEMAND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketEXHIBIT Doc # 4; C PATIENT RECORD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketPETITION TO APPOINT EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN Doc # 5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketEXHIBIT Doc # 6; A EXPENSES AND LETTER OF DEMAND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketEXHIBIT Doc # 7; B PHYSICIANS STATEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 8

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketPETITION TO SEAL Doc # 9

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketPROPOSED ORDER Doc # 10; TO SEAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less