This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/14/2019 at 05:01:55 (UTC).

IN RE: THE MATTER OF ALDO DELU

Case Summary

On 12/17/2018 IN RE THE MATTER OF ALDO DELU was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLAN, LINDA R. and COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-IN

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ALLAN, LINDA R.

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOWACK, MICHELLE

Clearwater, FL 33759

Not Classified By Court

DELU, ALDO

Clearwater, FL 33763

LLAUGET, JOHN

Largo, FL 33770

MCCLAIN, VALERIE

Tampa, FL 33603

LEIMBACHER, JEFFREY E, MD

Clearwater, FL 33762

BOONE, JAMES, PHD

Tarpon Springs, FL 34688

SAMUEL, TRACI

St Petersburg, FL 33711

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STEVEN E HITCHCOCK

635 Court St Ste 202

Clearwater, FL 33756

Not Classified By Court Attorney

CYNTHIA RAYHORN

1707 Erna Dr

Tampa, FL 33603

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • IN/GD; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officers TEARNEY, BAMA, SAMIS, KEELA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • CANCELED; IN/GD; (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer SAMIS, KEELA); MOVING PARTY CANCELLED HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • SHERIFF'S RETURN; Doc # 18; SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • REPORT OF COMMITTEE; Doc # 17; BOONE COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • NOTICE ALLEG INC, ORD APT COM, CNSEL, PROC SER; Doc # 13; AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • ORDER APPOINTING EMERGENCY TEMP GUARDIAN; Doc # 14; Vol./Book 20389, Page 550, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • LETTERS OF EMG TEMP GDN; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • REPORT OF COMMITTEE; Doc # 16; LLAUGET COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • MASTER'S FINDINGS RECOMMENDED ORDER; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • REPORT OF COMMITTEE; Doc # 12; LEIMBACHER

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2018
  • EXHIBIT; Doc # 10; B - DESIGNATION OF HEALTH CARE SURROGATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • PETITION TO APPOINT EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • ATTORNEY APPOINTED; Doc # 4; CYNTHIA RAYHORN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • NOTICE ALLEG INC, ORD APT COM, CNSEL, PROC SER; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE INCAPACITY; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • PETITIONER; LOWACK, MICHELLE; Total Financial Assessment; 271.00; Total Payments and Credits; 271.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2019-00134; SAMUEL, TRACI; (40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • PETITIONER; LOWACK, MICHELLE; Total Financial Assessment; 271.00; Total Payments and Credits; 271.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • PETITIONER; LOWACK, MICHELLE; Total Financial Assessment; 271.00; Total Payments and Credits; 271.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2018-45769; LOWACK, MICHELLE; (231.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • PETITIONER; LOWACK, MICHELLE; Total Financial Assessment; 271.00; Total Payments and Credits; 271.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 231.00

    Read MoreRead Less