This case was last updated from Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/20/2023 at 14:48:46 (UTC).

IN RE: THE GUARDIANSHIP OF THOMAS PODSIADLIK

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 IN RE THE GUARDIANSHIP OF THOMAS PODSIADLIK was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Pinellas County 6th Judicial Circuit Courts, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-GD

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PODSIADLIK, DENISE

Not Classified By Court

PODSIADLIK, THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

AUBREY ELIZABETH POSEY

Not Classified By Court Attorney

N MICHAEL KOUSKOUTIS, ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketBACKGROUND CHECK RECEIPT Doc # 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • FinancialATTORNEY OF RECORD; POSEY, AUBREY ELIZABETH; Total Financial Assessment; 27.50; Total Payments and Credits; 27.50; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2022-41946; 161396098; (27.50)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • FinancialATTORNEY OF RECORD; POSEY, AUBREY ELIZABETH; Total Financial Assessment; 27.50; Total Payments and Credits; 27.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 27.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketGUARDIANSHIP CHECKLIST Doc # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING Doc # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • FinancialPETITIONER; PODSIADLIK, DENISE; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2022-38745; PODSIADLIK, DENISE; (400.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • FinancialPETITIONER; PODSIADLIK, DENISE; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN Doc # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN Doc # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN Doc # 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less