Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 03/29/2021 at 23:00:13 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF VIVIAN G CARTER

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 IN RE THE ESTATE OF VIVIAN G CARTER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-ES

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEDINA, VICKI L

Winter Park, FL 32792

Decedent

CARTER, VIVIAN G

Largo, FL 33771

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 7; VIVIAN GRACE CARTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketORDER - CHECKLIST; Doc # 6; E-MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; MEDINA, VICKI L; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2021-07179; MEDINA, VICKI L; (345.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; MEDINA, VICKI L; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 1; Vol./Book 21403, Page 2418, 4 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketWAIVER AND CONSENT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRSHIP; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 4; OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 5; VIVIAN GRACE CARTER

    Read MoreRead Less