This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/07/2019 at 05:00:33 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF VINCENTINA FRAZER

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 IN RE THE ESTATE OF VINCENTINA FRAZER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-ES

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FRAZER, KENNETH

Oldsmar, FL 34677

Decedent

FRAZER, VINCENTINA

Palm Harbor, FL 34684

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STEPHEN R WILLIAMS

Attorney at WILLIAMS RISTOFF PROPER PLC

10820 St Rd 54 Ste 202

Trinity, FL 34655

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • COMMISSION, OATH OF WITNESS & CERTIFICATE; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • ORDER - CHECKLIST; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE REQUESTING COPY; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 10; VINCENTINA FRAZER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • BOND $; Doc # 11; 18,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • WILL; Doc # 12; 8-19-13 3 PGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • PETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 1; 35,333.34; Vol./Book 20396, Page 1100, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 3; VINCENTINA FRAZER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • COPY OF BOND; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 5; ADMITTING AND APPOINTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • PROPOSED LETTERS; Doc # 6; OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • COMMISSION, OATH OF WITNESS & CERTIFICATE; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COMMISSIONER; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • PETITIONER; FRAZER, KENNETH; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2019-01431; FRAZER, KENNETH; (400.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • PETITIONER; FRAZER, KENNETH; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • ATTORNEY OF RECORD; WILLIAMS, STEPHEN R; Total Financial Assessment; 9.63; Total Payments and Credits; 9.63; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # PR-2019-000626; WILLIAMS, STEPHEN R; (9.63)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • ATTORNEY OF RECORD; WILLIAMS, STEPHEN R; Total Financial Assessment; 9.63; Total Payments and Credits; 9.63; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 9.63

    Read MoreRead Less