This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/18/2021 at 23:19:50 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF STEPHEN PETER GUARDINO, III

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 IN RE THE ESTATE OF STEPHEN PETER GUARDINO, III was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-ES

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GUARDINO, BARBARA

Clearwater, FL 33765

Decedents

GUARDINO, STEPHEN PETER

Oldsmar, FL 34677

GUARDINO, STEPHEN PETER, III

Clearwater, FL 33765

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILLIAM RAMBAUM

Attorney at WILLIAM RAMBAUM PA

3684 Tampa Road Suite 2

Oldsmar, FL 34677

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE BY MAIL; Doc # 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketBOND $; Doc # 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 23; Vol./Book 21364, Page 1819, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCLERKS SUMMARY WORKSLIP - INTAKE; Doc # 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 21; STEPHEN PETER GUARDINO III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINT PERS REP; Doc # 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 18; ADMITTING LOST WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketWILL (R); Doc # 19; Vol./Book 21357, Page 980, 5 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 7; A - COPY OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 8; B - CORRESPONDANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF WILL; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 11; A COPY OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 13; A - COPY OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Doc # 14; B CORRESPONDANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 15; ADMITTING LOST WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED LETTERS; Doc # 16; OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMBAUM , WILLIAM BRIAN