This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/14/2019 at 05:01:22 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF SHERMAN MCVEIGH BYWATER

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 IN RE THE ESTATE OF SHERMAN MCVEIGH BYWATER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-ES

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

WILSON, GREGORY S.

Lutz, FL 33558

Decedent

BYWATER, SHERMAN MCVEIGH

Clearwater, FL 33762

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

MORRIS A LECOMPTE

5245 Central Avenue

St Petersburg, FL 33710

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • RIDER TO BOND; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINT PERS REP; Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING CODICIL TO PROBATE; Doc # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 18; Vol./Book 20424, Page 2119, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • ESTATE BOND APPROVED $; Doc # 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • CLERKS SUMMARY WORKSLIP - INTAKE; Doc # 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • BOND $; Doc # 13; 2,600,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • AMENDED PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 11; Vol./Book 20415, Page 2080, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 8; SHERMAN MC VEIGH BYWATER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • WILL (R); Doc # 9; 03-18-15 16 PGS; Vol./Book 20424, Page 2077, 16 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • PETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 1; 13,000,000; Vol./Book 20402, Page 148, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 4; ADMITTING AND APPOINTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 5; ADMITTING CODICIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • PROPOSED LETTERS; Doc # 6; OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; WILSON, GREGORY S. Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2019-02364; WILSON, GREGORY S. (400.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; WILSON, GREGORY S. Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less