This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 12/29/2020 at 23:01:20 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF SARAH Y D'ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 IN RE THE ESTATE OF SARAH Y D'ANTONIO was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-ES

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DOBSON, EVELYN M

Rockledge, FL 32955

Decedents

D'ANTONIO, SARAH

St Petersburg, FL 33709

D'ANTONIO, SARAH Y ALSO KNOWN AS D'ANTONIO, SALLY Y ALSO KNOWN AS D'ANTONIO, SALLY YOUNG ALSO KNOWN AS D'ANTONIO, SARAH

St Petersburg, FL 33709

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JESSICA LYNN SILVA, ESQ

7341 Office Park Place Suite 202

Viera, FL 32940

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO COURT; Doc # 29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 30; ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketORDER - CHECKLIST; Doc # 27; EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2020
  • FinancialATTORNEY OF RECORD; SILVA, JESSICA LYNN, ESQ; Total Financial Assessment; 3.50; Total Payments and Credits; 3.50; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketOATH OF WITNESS TO WILL; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • FinancialPETITIONER; DOBSON, EVELYN M; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2020-37865; DOBSON, EVELYN M; (400.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • FinancialPETITIONER; DOBSON, EVELYN M; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 1; Vol./Book 21270, Page 1357, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 4; SARAH Y D'ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketWILL; Doc # 25; 04/16/2015 2 PGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 26; SARAH Y D'ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less