This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/18/2021 at 23:18:56 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF ROSEMARIE C. PIFF

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 IN RE THE ESTATE OF ROSEMARIE C PIFF was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-ES

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PAPPAS, GEORGE G

Clearwater, FL 33765

Decedents

PIFF, ROSEMARIE

Clearwater, FL 33765

PIFF, ROSEMARIE C.

Clearwater, FL 33763

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GEORGE G PAPPAS

Attorney at GEORGE G PAPPAS PA

1822 North Belcher Rd Suite 200

Clearwater, FL 33765

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Doc # 17; SECOND AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketORDER - CHECKLIST; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 16; WILLIAM ROBERT BELLE JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Doc # 12; AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 13; WILLIAM ROBERT BELLE JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketORDER - CHECKLIST; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 8; ROSEMARIE C PIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketBOND $; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; PAPPAS, GEORGE G; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2021-01754; PAPPAS, GEORGE G; (400.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; PAPPAS, GEORGE G; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 1; Vol./Book 21342, Page 2519, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 4; ROSEMARIE C PIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF BOND; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 6; ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED LETTERS; Doc # 7; OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketWILL; Doc # 10; DATED 09/25/2015 6 PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEORGE G PAPPAS