This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/18/2019 at 05:01:29 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF ROBERT J. STRAZISAR

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 IN RE THE ESTATE OF ROBERT J STRAZISAR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLAN, LINDA R. and COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-ES

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ALLAN, LINDA R.

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STRAZISAR, THOMAS

Cleveland, OH 44109

Decedent

STRAZISAR, ROBERT J.

St. Petersburg, FL 33702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CYNTHIA I WAISMAN

Attorney at CYNTHIA I WAISMAN P A

2451 N Mcmullen Booth Rd Ste 239

Clearwater, FL 33759

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • CLAIM FILED; Doc # 10; THOMAS STRAZISAR FEE PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • CORRESPONDENCE REQUESTING COPY; Doc # 6; 6CC LADM SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 7; ROBERT J STRAZISAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • PETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 1; 125,000; Vol./Book 20378, Page 765, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 2; APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • AFFIDAVIT-NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • PROPOSED LETTERS; Doc # 5; ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • PETITIONER; STRAZISAR, THOMAS; Total Financial Assessment; 402.00; Total Payments and Credits; 402.00; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # PR-2019-000658; STRAZISAR, THOMAS; (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • PETITIONER; STRAZISAR, THOMAS; Total Financial Assessment; 402.00; Total Payments and Credits; 402.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • PETITIONER; STRAZISAR, THOMAS; Total Financial Assessment; 402.00; Total Payments and Credits; 402.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2018-46524; STRAZISAR, THOMAS; (400.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • PETITIONER; STRAZISAR, THOMAS; Total Financial Assessment; 402.00; Total Payments and Credits; 402.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • ATTORNEY OF RECORD; WAISMAN, CYNTHIA I; Total Financial Assessment; 18.00; Total Payments and Credits; 18.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # PR-2018-013857; WAISMAN, CYNTHIA I; (18.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • ATTORNEY OF RECORD; WAISMAN, CYNTHIA I; Total Financial Assessment; 18.00; Total Payments and Credits; 18.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 18.00

    Read MoreRead Less