This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/31/2019 at 05:00:50 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF PAUL SOPER

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 IN RE THE ESTATE OF PAUL SOPER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLAN, LINDA R. and COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-ES

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ALLAN, LINDA R.

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCNEAVE, CYNTHIA J

St. Petersburg, FL 33771

Decedent

SOPER, PAUL

St Petersburg, FL 33708

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SEAN SCOTT

3233 East Bay Dr Ste 104

Largo, FL 33771

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 14; Vol./Book 20400, Page 466, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • CLERKS SUMMARY WORKSLIP - INTAKE; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE REQUESTING COPY; Doc # 9; 2CC OAWS PP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • WILL (R); Doc # 10; 12-9-14 5PGS; Vol./Book 20400, Page 417, 5 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 11; PAUL A SOPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 2; 18,227.77; Vol./Book 20389, Page 319, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • COPY OF WILL; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 4; PAUL A SOPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 6; ADMITTING WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 7; OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT-NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • WILL; Doc # 12; 06/15/1973 4PGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • PETITIONER; MCNEAVE, CYNTHIA J; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2019-00390; MCNEAVE, CYNTHIA J; (345.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • PETITIONER; MCNEAVE, CYNTHIA J; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • ATTORNEY OF RECORD; SCOTT, SEAN; Total Financial Assessment; 6.63; Total Payments and Credits; 6.63; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # PR-2019-000249; SCOTT, SEAN; (6.63)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • ATTORNEY OF RECORD; SCOTT, SEAN; Total Financial Assessment; 6.63; Total Payments and Credits; 6.63; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 6.63

    Read MoreRead Less