Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 05/12/2021 at 23:04:51 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF NORMAN H DAVIS, V

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 IN RE THE ESTATE OF NORMAN H DAVIS, V was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-ES

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Decedents

DAVIS, NORMAN H

Spring Hill, FL 34606

DAVIS, NORMAN H, IV

Spring Hill, FL 34606

DAVIS, NORMAN H, V

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

DAVIS, NORMAN H, IV

Spring Hill, FL 34606

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

DAVID ALLEN BUCK

5330 Springhill Drive, Suite E

Springhill, FL 34606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialDECEDENT; DAVIS, NORMAN H, V; Total Financial Assessment; 2.00; Total Payments and Credits; 2.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # PR-2021-003411; FORTE LLC; (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialDECEDENT; DAVIS, NORMAN H, V; Total Financial Assessment; 2.00; Total Payments and Credits; 2.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCLAIM FILED; Doc # 15; CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. PLATINUM, FEE PD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 14; Vol./Book 21497, Page 996, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketORDER - CHECKLIST; Doc # 13; EMAILED 4/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED LETTERS; Doc # 11; OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 12; APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 10; NORMAN HARCOURT DAVIS V

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; DAVIS, NORMAN H, IV; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2021-13626; DAVIS, NORMAN H; (400.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; DAVIS, NORMAN H, IV; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 1; Vol./Book 21475, Page 1719, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRSHIP; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Doc # 4; CONCERNING CRIMINAL HISTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 6; NORMAN HARCOURT DAVIS V

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 7; IVANHIA DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUCK, DAVID ALLEN