This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/14/2019 at 05:00:44 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF MURIEL HUGHES

Case Summary

On 12/17/2018 IN RE THE ESTATE OF MURIEL HUGHES was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLAN, LINDA R. and COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-ES

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ALLAN, LINDA R.

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HUGHES, WILLIAM JAMES

Largo, FL 33771-1900

Decedent

HUGHES, MURIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAVID A LUCZAK

3233 East Bay Drive Suite 103

Largo, FL 33771

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • AMENDED PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 11; Vol./Book 20390, Page 2381, 4 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 12; ADMIT WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 13; SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • ORDER - CHECKLIST; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 8; MURIEL DIANNE HUGHES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 5; SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 6; ADMIT WILL UNSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 1; 25,000.00; Vol./Book 20370, Page 1810, 4 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • AFFIDAVIT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 3; MURIEL DIANE HUGHES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • WILL; Doc # 9; 1/12/89

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • PETITIONER; HUGHES, WILLIAM JAMES; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2018-45621; HUGHES, WILLIAM JAMES; (345.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • PETITIONER; HUGHES, WILLIAM JAMES; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 345.00

    Read MoreRead Less