This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/24/2019 at 05:01:30 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF MARY DOBBS

Case Summary

On 12/27/2018 IN RE THE ESTATE OF MARY DOBBS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-ES

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANDERSON, SANDRA K

St. Petersburg, FL 33703

Decedents

DOBBS, MARY

Largo, FL 33770

DOBBS, MARY ALSO KNOWN AS DOBBS, MARY A ALSO KNOWN AS DOBBS, MARY ANNETTE

Largo, FL 33770

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAVID F WILSEY

Attorney at FISHER AND WILSEY PA

1000 16Th St North

St Petersburg, FL 33705-1147

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • CLAIM - AGENCY FOR HEALTHCARE ADMIN FL; Doc # 19; HMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • ORDER TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD; Doc # 15; Vol./Book 20399, Page 2466, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 16; Vol./Book 20399, Page 2475, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • CLERKS SUMMARY WORKSLIP - INTAKE; Doc # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 11; MARY ANNETTE DOBBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 2; 141,000.00; Vol./Book 20380, Page 2635, 4 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD; Doc # 3; Vol./Book 20380, Page 2644, 4 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 7; ADMITTING WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 8; OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 9; DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • WILL; Doc # 12; 07/21/2006 5 PGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • WILL (R); Doc # 13; 07/02/2014 20 PGS; Vol./Book 20399, Page 1808, 20 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • PETITIONER; ANDERSON, SANDRA K; Total Financial Assessment; 353.00; Total Payments and Credits; 353.00; Balance Due 0.00; Draw Down Account; Receipt # SB-2019-00895; WILSEY, DAVID F; (8.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • PETITIONER; ANDERSON, SANDRA K; Total Financial Assessment; 353.00; Total Payments and Credits; 353.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • PETITIONER; ANDERSON, SANDRA K; Total Financial Assessment; 353.00; Total Payments and Credits; 353.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2018-46902; ANDERSON, SANDRA K; (345.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • PETITIONER; ANDERSON, SANDRA K; Total Financial Assessment; 353.00; Total Payments and Credits; 353.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 345.00

    Read MoreRead Less