This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/14/2019 at 05:00:23 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF LOUIS SCHIAVETTI

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 IN RE THE ESTATE OF LOUIS SCHIAVETTI was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-ES

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Trustees and Not Classified By Court

SCOTT-MOONEY, SANDRA

Palm Harbor, FL 34685

SCOTT-MOONEY, SANDRA J SCOTT-MOONEY, SANDRA

Palm Harbor, FL 34685

Decedent

SCHIAVETTI, LOUIS

Safety Harbor, FL 34695

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Trustee and Not Classified By Court Attorney

GARY MARTIN FERNALD

611 Druid Rd E Ste 705

Clearwater, FL 33756

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 17; Vol./Book 20417, Page 837, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • ESTATE BOND APPROVED $; Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • CLERKS SUMMARY WORKSLIP - INTAKE; Doc # 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • MEMORANDUM; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • BOND $; Doc # 13; 18000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 14; LOUIS F SCHIAVETTI JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • ORDER - CHECKLIST; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 9; ADMIT WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2019
  • COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 3; LOUIS F SCHIAVETTI JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • COPY OF BOND; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • WILL (R); Doc # 7; 10-18-12 3 PGS; Vol./Book 20417, Page 807, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; SCOTT-MOONEY, SANDRA J; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2019-02340; SCOTT-MOONEY, SANDRA; (400.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; SCOTT-MOONEY, SANDRA J; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • ATTORNEY OF RECORD; FERNALD, GARY MARTIN; Total Financial Assessment; 44.69; Total Payments and Credits; 44.69; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # PR-2019-001602; FERNALD, GARY MARTIN; (3.69)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • ATTORNEY OF RECORD; FERNALD, GARY MARTIN; Total Financial Assessment; 44.69; Total Payments and Credits; 44.69; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 3.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • ATTORNEY OF RECORD; FERNALD, GARY MARTIN; Total Financial Assessment; 44.69; Total Payments and Credits; 44.69; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PAYMENT; Receipt # PR-2019-000893; FERNALD, GARY MARTIN; (41.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • ATTORNEY OF RECORD; FERNALD, GARY MARTIN; Total Financial Assessment; 44.69; Total Payments and Credits; 44.69; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 41.00

    Read MoreRead Less