Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 03/29/2021 at 23:00:24 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF JON DAVID PRITCHARD

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 IN RE THE ESTATE OF JON DAVID PRITCHARD was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-ES

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CAMPBELL, PAMELA AM

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PRITCHARD, ADRIAN DEVIN

St Petersburg, FL 33711

Decedent

PRITCHARD, JON DAVID

St Petersburg, FL 33711

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ELIZABETH D MONEYMAKER

2429 Central Ave., Suite 206

St. Petersburg, FL 33713

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 13; Vol./Book 21458, Page 1473, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINT PERS REP; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCLERKS SUMMARY WORKSLIP - INTAKE; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketESTATE BOND APPROVED $; Doc # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 11; ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED LETTERS; Doc # 12; OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketBOND $; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketORDER - CHECKLIST; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWILL; Doc # 7; 09-24-2011 6PGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 8; JON DAVID PRITCHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; PRITCHARD, ADRIAN DEVIN; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2021-07037; PRITCHARD, ADRIAN DEVIN; (400.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; PRITCHARD, ADRIAN DEVIN; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 1; Vol./Book 21401, Page 2019, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 5; JON DAVID PRITCHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH D MONEYMAKER