This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/15/2019 at 05:00:33 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF JO ANNE KAUFFMAN

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 IN RE THE ESTATE OF JO ANNE KAUFFMAN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4-ES

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ZELLER, JOSEPH L.

Clearwater, FL 33755

Decedents

KAUFFMAN, JO ANNE

Clearwater, FL 33755

KAUFFMAN, JO ANNE ALSO KNOWN AS ZELLER, JO ANNE

Clearwater, FL 33755

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NANCY OSET

2706 Alternate 19 North Ste 219

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • AMENDED ORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 21; Vol./Book 20421, Page 1304, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 19; OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • ORDER DETERMINING EXEMPT PROPERTY; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • ORDER TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD; Doc # 15; Vol./Book 20409, Page 1064, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 16; Vol./Book 20409, Page 1170, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • CLERKS SUMMARY WORKSLIP - INTAKE; Doc # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD; Doc # 3; Vol./Book 20402, Page 2247, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 4; ADMITTING WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 5; DETERMINING EXEMPT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 6; OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 7; DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • CERTIFICATE; Doc # 8; MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • WILL (R); Doc # 12; 4-27-16 5 PGS; Vol./Book 20409, Page 1015, 5 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • PETITIONER; ZELLER, JOSEPH L. Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2019-02499; ZELLER, JOSEPH L. (345.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • PETITIONER; ZELLER, JOSEPH L. Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 345.00

    Read MoreRead Less