This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/15/2019 at 05:02:09 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF JEROME MITCHELL

Case Summary

On 12/18/2018 IN RE THE ESTATE OF JEROME MITCHELL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALLAN, LINDA R.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1-ES

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALLAN, LINDA R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MITCHELL, DAVID JEROME

Clearwater, FL 33601

Decedent

MITCHELL, JEROME

St. Petersburg, FL 33711

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MARLA D BOHLANDER

Attorney at TRENAM, KE,KER, SCHARF, BARKIN, FRYE, O'NEILL & MULLIS, P.A.

1102

Tampa, FL 33601

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • CLAIM FILED; Doc # 14; BANK OF AMERICA, DCM - FEE PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • ORDER TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD; Doc # 10; Vol./Book 20389, Page 821, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 11; Vol./Book 20389, Page 823, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • CLERKS SUMMARY WORKSLIP - INTAKE; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 9; JEROME MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 1; 7,100; Vol./Book 20372, Page 1816, 5 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD; Doc # 2; Vol./Book 20372, Page 1821, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 4; DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 5; SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 7; JEROME MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • PETITIONER; MITCHELL, DAVID JEROME; Total Financial Assessment; 347.00; Total Payments and Credits; 347.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # PR-2019-000219; FORTE; (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • PETITIONER; MITCHELL, DAVID JEROME; Total Financial Assessment; 347.00; Total Payments and Credits; 347.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • PETITIONER; MITCHELL, DAVID JEROME; Total Financial Assessment; 347.00; Total Payments and Credits; 347.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2018-45887; MITCHELL, DAVID JEROME; (345.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • PETITIONER; MITCHELL, DAVID JEROME; Total Financial Assessment; 347.00; Total Payments and Credits; 347.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 345.00

    Read MoreRead Less