This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/01/2019 at 05:01:04 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF JENNIFER S. COHEN

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 IN RE THE ESTATE OF JENNIFER S COHEN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8-ES

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COHEN, ARTHUR B.

Marietta, GA 30062

Decedent

COHEN, JENNIFER S.

St. Petersburg, FL 33707

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CAROLYN T LEBOEUF, ESQ

4832-B Kerry Forest Parkway

Tallahassee, FL 32309

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 11; JENNIFER SUE COHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • CLAIM FILED; Doc # 9; ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES, - SYNCHRONY BANK-CARE CREDIT FEE PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • PETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 1; 75,800.00; Vol./Book 20390, Page 1937, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT-NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 3; JENNIFER SUE COHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF HEIRSHIP; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • WILL; Doc # 8; 8/21/18 3 PGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • PETITIONER; COHEN, ARTHUR B. Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2019-00675; COHEN, ARTHUR B. (345.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • PETITIONER; COHEN, ARTHUR B. Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DECEDENT; COHEN, JENNIFER S. Total Financial Assessment; 2.00; Total Payments and Credits; 2.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PAYMENT; Receipt # PR-2019-000806; ASCENSION POINT RECOVERY; (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DECEDENT; COHEN, JENNIFER S. Total Financial Assessment; 2.00; Total Payments and Credits; 2.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • ATTORNEY OF RECORD; LEBOEUF, CAROLYN T, ESQ; Total Financial Assessment; 55.00; Total Payments and Credits; 55.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # PR-2019-001070; LEBOEUF, CAROLYN T, ESQ; (55.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • ATTORNEY OF RECORD; LEBOEUF, CAROLYN T, ESQ; Total Financial Assessment; 55.00; Total Payments and Credits; 55.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less