This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/27/2019 at 05:00:43 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF JEFFREY J CLARK

Case Summary

On 01/30/2019 IN RE THE ESTATE OF JEFFREY J CLARK was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-ES

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STACY, JOYCE

Xenia, OH 45385

Decedents

CLARK, JEFFREY J

Largo, FL 33770

CLARK, JEFFREY J ALSO KNOWN AS CLARK, JEFFREY JAMES

Largo, FL 33770

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAVID A PEEK

Attorney at THE LEGAL CENTER

10700 Johnson Blvd Ste 1

Seminole, FL 33772

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 14; Vol./Book 20421, Page 2413, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • CLERKS SUMMARY WORKSLIP - INTAKE; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE REQUESTING COPY; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 13; JEFFREY JAMES CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE REQUESTING COPY; Doc # 1; 1 CC OAWS PP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 2; OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 3; JEFFREY JAMES CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF HEIRSHIP; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • EXHIBIT; Doc # 5; A BIRTH CERTIFICATE JEFFERY JAMES CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • EXHIBIT; Doc # 6; B COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE JAMES FRANK CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 9; 2,200.00; Vol./Book 20413, Page 116, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • PETITIONER; STACY, JOYCE; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2019-04229; STACY, JOYCE; (345.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • PETITIONER; STACY, JOYCE; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • ATTORNEY OF RECORD; PEEK, DAVID A; Total Financial Assessment; 4.69; Total Payments and Credits; 4.69; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # PR-2019-001271; PEEK, DAVID A; (4.69)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • ATTORNEY OF RECORD; PEEK, DAVID A; Total Financial Assessment; 4.69; Total Payments and Credits; 4.69; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 4.69

    Read MoreRead Less