Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 05/11/2021 at 05:03:47 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF GERTRUDEL MARY ANDREWS-GEIBEL

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 IN RE THE ESTATE OF GERTRUDEL MARY ANDREWS-GEIBEL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-ES

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GEIBEL, DANNY R.

St. Petersburg, FL 33702

Decedents

ANDREWS-GEIBEL, GERTRUDEL MARY

St. Petersburg, FL 33702

ANDREWS-GEIBEL, GERTRUDEL MARY ALSO KNOWN AS GEIBEL, GERTRUDE M

St. Petersburg, FL 33702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DEREK ALVAREZ

Attorney at GENDERS ALVAREZ DIECIDUE PA

2307 W Cleveland St

Tampa, FL 33609

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketORDER - CHECKLIST; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 11; GERTRUDE MARY ANDREWS-GEIBEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketWILL; Doc # 12; 01-17-2006 4 PGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketTO BE ISSUED; PROOF OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketORDER - CHECKLIST; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; GEIBEL, DANNY R. Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2021-14383; GEIBEL, DANNY R. (400.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; GEIBEL, DANNY R. Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION - LITIGATION PENDING (R); Doc # 1; Vol./Book 21484, Page 1449, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 3; GERTRUDE MARY ANDREWS-GEIBEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 6; SUSAN GREGORY / PARTIALLY REDACTED BY FILER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 7; ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINTING PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED LETTERS; Doc # 8; OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALVAREZ , DEREK B