This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/18/2021 at 23:19:22 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF ELSIE L GOSNEY

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 IN RE THE ESTATE OF ELSIE L GOSNEY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5-ES

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIAZ, LORI A

Safety Harbor, FL 34695

Decedent

GOSNEY, ELSIE L

Safety Harbor, FL 34695

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DENISE N MURPHY, ESQ

Attorney at DENISE N MURPHY PA

531 Main St Ste F

Safety Harbor, FL 34695

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 9; Vol./Book 21354, Page 2142, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCLERKS SUMMARY WORKSLIP - INTAKE; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketORDER - CHECKLIST; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMEMORANDUM; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 7; ELSIE LENA GOSNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 4; OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; DIAZ, LORI A; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2021-01739; DIAZ, LORI A; (345.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; DIAZ, LORI A; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 1; Vol./Book 21342, Page 2403, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURPHY , DENISE NICOLE