This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 03/05/2019 at 05:01:42 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF EILEEN J. GELIS

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 IN RE THE ESTATE OF EILEEN J GELIS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6-ES

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

GELIS, MICHAEL R.

Wimauma,, FL 33598

Decedent

GELIS, EILEEN J.

Clearwater, FL 33759

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

HAMDEN H BASKIN, III

Attorney at BASKIN EISEL

14020 Roosevelt Blvd Ste 808

Clearwater, FL 33762

RANDALL D BASKIN, ESQ

Attorney at BASKIN EISEL, ATTORNEYS AT LAW

14020 Roosevelt Boulevard, Suite 808

Clearwater, FL 33762

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINT PERS REP; Doc # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 18; Vol./Book 20438, Page 61, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • CLERKS SUMMARY WORKSLIP - INTAKE; Doc # 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • ESTATE BOND APPROVED $; Doc # 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • BOND $; Doc # 15; 18,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 16; EILEEN J GELIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • PETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 1; 41,604.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2019
  • COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 8; EILEEN J GELIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 10; ADMITTING AND APPOINTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • PROPOSED LETTERS; Doc # 11; OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • WILL (R); Doc # 12; 3/1/17 5 PGS; Vol./Book 20437, Page 2667, 5 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • SEPARATE WRITING; Doc # 13; BLANK 2 PGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; GELIS, MICHAEL R. Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2019-05223; GELIS, MICHAEL R. (400.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; GELIS, MICHAEL R. Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • ATTORNEY OF RECORD; BASKIN, HAMDEN H, III; Total Financial Assessment; 18.69; Total Payments and Credits; 18.69; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # PR-2019-002185; BASKIN, HAMDEN H, III; (18.69)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • ATTORNEY OF RECORD; BASKIN, HAMDEN H, III; Total Financial Assessment; 18.69; Total Payments and Credits; 18.69; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 18.69

    Read MoreRead Less