This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/14/2019 at 05:01:45 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF DONNA LEE RAYMOND

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 IN RE THE ESTATE OF DONNA LEE RAYMOND was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7-ES

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HORTON, CONSTANCE

Ocean Isle Beach, NC 33755

HORTON, CONSTANCE ALSO KNOWN AS FEDELI, CONSTANCE

Ocean Isle Beach, NC 28469

Decedent

RAYMOND, DONNA LEE ALSO KNOWN AS STAVASKI, DONNA LEE

Clearwater, FL 33763

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHRISTINA RANKIN

1010 Drew Street

Clearwater, FL 33755

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 15; Vol./Book 20408, Page 2622, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • ORDER TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD; Doc # 16; Vol./Book 20408, Page 2681, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • CLERKS SUMMARY WORKSLIP - INTAKE; Doc # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 13; DONNA LEE RAYMOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 11; DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 3; 11,000.00; Vol./Book 20401, Page 1722, 4 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 4; OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD; Doc # 5; Vol./Book 20401, Page 1730, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 6; DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 7; DONNA LEE RAYMOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF HEIRSHIP; Doc # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • PETITIONER; HORTON, CONSTANCE; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2019-02307; HORTON, CONSTANCE; (345.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • PETITIONER; HORTON, CONSTANCE; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 345.00

    Read MoreRead Less