This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/28/2019 at 05:01:37 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH T KUCHLE

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 IN RE THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH T KUCHLE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2-ES

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CAMPBELL, PAMELA A.M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KUCHLE, DOUGLAS J

Clearwater, FL 33759

Decedent

KUCHLE, DEBORAH T

Pinellas Park, FL 33781

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAVID P FOLKENFLIK

5742 54Th Ave N

Kenneth City, FL 33709

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 14; Vol./Book 20437, Page 1943, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • CLERKS SUMMARY WORKSLIP - INTAKE; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 12; SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT; Doc # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • ORDER - CHECKLIST; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Doc # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 9; DEBORAH THOMPSON KUCHLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT; Doc # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 1; 69,892.88; Vol./Book 20414, Page 1884, 4 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT-NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF HEIRSHIP; Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 6; DEBORAH THOMPSON KUCHLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • PETITIONER; KUCHLE, DOUGLAS J; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2019-04491; KUCHLE, DOUGLAS J; (345.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • PETITIONER; KUCHLE, DOUGLAS J; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 345.00

    Read MoreRead Less