Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 03/29/2021 at 23:03:09 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF CATHERINE MARIE BEATY

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 IN RE THE ESTATE OF CATHERINE MARIE BEATY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-ES

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BEATY, STEVEN P

Dunedin, FL 34698

Decedents

BEATY, CATHERINE

Dunedin, FL 34698

BEATY, CATHERINE MARIE ALSO KNOWN AS BEATY, CATHERINE ALSO KNOWN AS BEATY, CATHERINE M

Dunedin, FL 34698

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JOHN FREDERICK FREEBORN

360 Monroe Street

Dunedin, FL 34698

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 8; Vol./Book 21422, Page 194, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCLERKS SUMMARY WORKSLIP - INTAKE; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialATTORNEY OF RECORD; FREEBORN, JOHN FREDERICK; Total Financial Assessment; 4.69; Total Payments and Credits; 4.69; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # PR-2021-001589; FREEBORN, JOHN FREDERICK; (4.69)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialATTORNEY OF RECORD; FREEBORN, JOHN FREDERICK; Total Financial Assessment; 4.69; Total Payments and Credits; 4.69; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 4.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED; Doc # 6; EFILING CONFIRMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 7; CATHERINE MARIE BEATY - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; BEATY, STEVEN P; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2021-07177; BEATY, STEVEN P; (345.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialPETITIONER; BEATY, STEVEN P; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE REQUESTING COPY; Doc # 1; 1 CC OAWS PP SG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 3; Vol./Book 21403, Page 2294, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRSHIP; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 5; OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN FREDERICK FREEBORN