This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/18/2021 at 23:20:00 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF BRODERICK MILES KING

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 IN RE THE ESTATE OF BRODERICK MILES KING was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3-ES

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

GAGNON, TRACEY

Dunedin, FL 34698

Decedents

KING, BRIDERICK MILES

Dunedin, FL 34698

KING, BRODERICK MILES

Dunedin, FL 34698

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

GARY M FERNALD

611 Druid Rd E Ste 705

Clearwater, FL 33756

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS; Doc # 22; 1-29-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Doc # 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS; Doc # 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialATTORNEY OF RECORD; FERNALD, GARY M; Total Financial Assessment; 3.69; Total Payments and Credits; 3.69; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # PR-2021-000596; FERNALD, GARY M; (3.69)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialATTORNEY OF RECORD; FERNALD, GARY M; Total Financial Assessment; 3.69; Total Payments and Credits; 3.69; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 3.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Doc # 16; Vol./Book 21352, Page 2518, 1 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketESTATE BOND APPROVED $; Doc # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCLERKS SUMMARY WORKSLIP - INTAKE; Doc # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 9; APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE BY MAIL; Doc # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE BY MAIL; Doc # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; GAGNON, TRACEY; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2021-01751; GAGNON, TRACEY; (400.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialPERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; GAGNON, TRACEY; Total Financial Assessment; 400.00; Total Payments and Credits; 400.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 2; Vol./Book 21342, Page 2515, 2 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; Doc # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 4; BRODERICK MILES KING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF BOND; Doc # 5; $18,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARY M FERNALD