This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 02/25/2019 at 05:02:23 (UTC).

IN RE: THE ESTATE OF BETTY THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 IN RE THE ESTATE OF BETTY THOMPSON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLEMAN, SHERWOOD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0-ES

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Pinellas Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Clearwater Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLEMAN, SHERWOOD

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DAHLVIK, NATHAN

Gilbertsville, KY 42044

PRINGLE, LAURA ROBLES, LAURA

Largo, FL 33773

Decedent

THOMPSON, BETTY

Clearwater, FL 33764

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THOMAS C NASH, II

1669

Clearwater, FL 33757

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE; Doc # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 16; ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • ORDER - CHECKLIST; Doc # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE REQUESTING COPY; Doc # 11; 2CC OAWS 2CC ODHS PU CLW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 12; BETTY HART THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • FORMAL NOTICE BY MAIL; Doc # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (R); Doc # 2; 84,000.00; Vol./Book 20410, Page 526, 4 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD; Doc # 3; Vol./Book 20410, Page 530, 3 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • FUNERAL BILL; Doc # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES); Doc # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILE; Doc # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 7; DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 8; OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER; Doc # 9; ADMITTING WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; Doc # 10; BETTY HART THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • WILL; Doc # 13; 9/27/13 3 PGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • PETITIONER; DAHLVIK, NATHAN; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; EFILE PROBATE AUTO; Receipt # EF-2019-03772; DAHLVIK, NATHAN; (345.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • PETITIONER; DAHLVIK, NATHAN; Total Financial Assessment; 345.00; Total Payments and Credits; 345.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • ATTORNEY OF RECORD; NASH, THOMAS C, II; Total Financial Assessment; 8.00; Total Payments and Credits; 8.00; Balance Due 0.00; Mail Payment; Receipt # PR-2019-001211; NASH, THOMAS C, II; (8.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • ATTORNEY OF RECORD; NASH, THOMAS C, II; Total Financial Assessment; 8.00; Total Payments and Credits; 8.00; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 8.00

    Read MoreRead Less